|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 6325.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4695.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 24. Page 4990.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|