|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6515.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4859.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 4766.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|