California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill July 6, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012