California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill July 6, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012