04/26/2012 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4547.) In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/25/2012 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/16/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |