|
08/30/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 15. Page 4443.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Liu. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4443.)
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 13. Page 1437.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|