California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2595 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 14, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012