LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB26
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB26
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB26
Action History
05/26/2011
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/05/2011
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
03/22/2011
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
03/15/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
01/27/2011
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
12/07/2010
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
12/06/2010
Read first time. To print.