05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/18/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |