|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6565.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4892.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5137.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|