|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2084.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 1647.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|