|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 562, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 9. Page 6386.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4750.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5176.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 14. Page 5203.)
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5139.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|