07/03/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/24/2012 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/17/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/10/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |