California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2616 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 9, 2012
Bill May 2, 2012
Bill April 18, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012