|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4474.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5059.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|