05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/19/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
04/18/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D. & E. and B. & F. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |