06/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 5099.) | |||
05/17/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/15/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (May 9). | |||
05/03/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |