08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
06/25/2012 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
05/17/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/17/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4888.) | |||
05/10/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |