|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 4711.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on J., E.D. & E. and B., P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|