California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2638 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill July 5, 2012
Bill June 11, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill March 28, 2012