02/01/2012 | Died on inactive file. | |||
06/02/2011 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ammiano. | |||
05/04/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/03/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/02/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 26). | |||
04/12/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/07/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/05/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/18/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/08/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | |||
02/07/2011 | Read first time. To print. |