California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2654 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 11, 2012