08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
07/02/2012 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/20/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/04/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5182.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |