|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 864, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6428.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4784.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4888.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|