08/14/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 5098.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
03/01/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/29/2012 | Read first time. To print. |