|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5881.).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4321.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4888.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|