07/09/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 60, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/09/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/28/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m. | |||
06/18/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/18/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3958.). | |||
06/14/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/13/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |||
05/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/07/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/07/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4717.) | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. | |||
03/06/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. | |||
03/05/2012 | Read first time. To print. |