07/09/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/09/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/28/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m. | |||
06/18/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/18/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3958.). | |||
06/14/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/13/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |||
04/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/23/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4491.) | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
03/06/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. | |||
03/05/2012 | Read first time. To print. |