|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 2830.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2139.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 1552.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|