|
08/23/2012
|
Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Simitian.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4789.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|