|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 827, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 6430.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4744.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4712.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|