|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 769, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6665.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4957.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4786.)
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4888.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|