California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2682 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2012

Amended

Bill June 7, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012