09/29/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 758, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/29/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
09/13/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |||
08/29/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4953.). | |||
07/06/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/05/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). | |||
06/25/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 4780.) | |||
05/08/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/07/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 1). | |||
03/13/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 12. | |||
03/12/2012 | Read first time. To print. |