08/08/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
06/04/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5185.) | |||
05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/15/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/07/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/13/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 12. | |||
03/12/2012 | Read first time. To print. |