|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4949.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Correa.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4784.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|