|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 350, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6329.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4716.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4789.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|