|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4446.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4788.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|