07/02/2012 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |||
07/02/2012 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly. Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/28/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m. | |||
06/15/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/15/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3939.). | |||
06/13/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 11). | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
05/17/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/17/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4887.) | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 7). | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
03/20/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 19. | |||
03/19/2012 | Read first time. To print. |