02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/18/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Received May 6 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2).) | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | |||
05/02/2011 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1169.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1169.) (Pending re-referral to Com. on A. & A.R.) | |||
04/11/2011 | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | |||
02/08/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | |||
02/07/2011 | Read first time. To print. |