01/17/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
05/16/2011 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/02/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
04/04/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/09/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/08/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/09/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | |||
02/08/2011 | Read first time. To print. |