LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB28
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB28
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB28
Compare Versions
AB28 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB28 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB28 Amended August 18, 2011
AB28 Amended July 6, 2011
AB28 Amended May 10, 2011
AB28 Amended April 26, 2011
AB28 Amended March 31, 2011
AB28 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB28 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB28 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB28 Amended August 18, 2011
AB28 Amended July 6, 2011
AB28 Amended May 10, 2011
AB28 Amended April 26, 2011
AB28 Amended March 31, 2011
AB28 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare