07/25/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/25/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/11/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. | |||
07/01/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/01/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1690.). | |||
06/29/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/28/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1454.) | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
03/15/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/09/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | |||
02/08/2011 | Read first time. To print. |