01/10/2012 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/12/2011 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/07/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/05/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/09/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | |||
02/08/2011 | Read first time. To print. |