|
06/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wyland.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1471.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|