|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 6. Page 3053.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2357.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 1638.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|