09/06/2011 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
08/24/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
08/18/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/18/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1966.). | |||
07/13/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 11). | |||
06/21/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/08/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
04/11/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/11/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 908.) | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 6). | |||
03/16/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
02/10/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | |||
02/09/2011 | Read first time. To print. |