02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/25/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/14/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 11). | |||
04/06/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Read first time. To print. |