|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 638, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 2831.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2137.).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 909.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|