|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2320.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1042.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|